You have been learning how to multiply 2 and 3 digit numbers by 1 digit using a formal written method.

Solve these calculations. Do your working out on a whiteboard.

- 234 x 5 =
- 385 x 4 =
- 503 x 7 =
- 684 x 6 =
- 869 x 8 =

Challenge:

- 46 x 15 =
- 58 x 24 =
- 69 x 27 =
- 94 x 36 =

1170

1540

3521

3678

6726

Lyba

What is our home work again please

Sorry for asking

1.1170

2.1540

3.3521

4.4104

5.6952

1.690

2.1392

3.1863

4.3564

I solved the calculations in my math book

1.1,170 2 . 1,540 3. 3521 4. 4104 5.6942

Challenge

1. 4290. 2. 1390 3. 1863 4. 3384.

By Ruqayyah and Sufyaan.

We solved

1. 234 x 5 = 1170

2. 385 x 4 = 1540

3. 503 x 7 = 3521

4. 684 x 6 = 4104

5. 869 x 8 = 6952

Challenge:

1. 46 x 15 = 690

2. 58 x 24 = 2392

3. 69 x 27 = 1862

4. 94 x 36 = 3384

By Elyass and Haleema

Me and Safa.M did the calculations in our maths books.

Me as Maleeha

I mean Alisha

1)234 x 5 = 1170

2)385 x 4 = 1540

3)503 x 7 = 3521

4)684 x 6 = 4104

5)869 x 8 = 6592

Challenge:

46 x 15 = 330

58 x 24 = 2832

69 x 27 = 3483

94 x 36 = 4464

By Safa and Hamda

234 ✖️5 = 1170

385 ✖️4 = 1540

503 ✖️ = 3521

684 ✖️ = 4104.

869 ✖️ 8 = 6952✏️

46 ✖️15 = 690

What are the big crosses,you could have used an x.

Me and Abdel did the calculation in our books

Abdel Nithusha

1 1170 1170

2 1540. 1540

3 3521. 3521

4 3678. 3678

5 6726. 6726

Challenge

1 690. 690

2 1392. 1392

3 1863. 1863

4 3384. 3384